1st |
president |
Um Yeongseok |
Hankuk University of Foreign Studies |
1994.04.09 - 1996.04.08 |
2nd |
president |
Kim Sewon |
Seoul National University |
1996.04.09 - 1998.04.08 |
3rd |
president |
Hwang Duhyeon |
Hongik University |
1998.04.09 - 2000.04.08 |
4th |
president |
Kim Jaecheol |
Korea Advanced Institute of Science and Technology (KAIST) |
2000.04.09 - 2001.12.31 |
5th |
president |
Yoon Changho |
Korea University |
2002.01.01 - 2003.12.31 |
6th |
president |
Lee Bongho |
Seoul Women's University |
2004.01.01 - 2005.12.31 |
7th |
president |
Lee Gwangcheol |
Hongik University |
2006.01.01 - 2006.12.31 |
8th |
president |
Yang Yuseok |
Chung-Ang University |
2007.01.01 - 2007.12.31 |
9th |
president |
Yeom Myeongbae |
Chungnam National University |
2008.01.01 - 2009.12.31 |
10th |
president |
Jang Seokgwon |
Hanyang University |
2010.01.01 - 2011.12.31 |
11th |
president |
Kim Dongju |
Korea University |
2012.01.01 - 2013.12.31 |
12th |
president |
Kim Sangtaek |
Ewha Womans University |
2014.01.01 - 2015.12.31 |
13th |
president |
Lee Wonu |
Seoul National University |
2016.01.01 - 2017.12.31 |
14th |
president |
Kang Hyeongcheol |
Sookmyung Women's University |
2018.01.01 - 2019.12.31 |
15th |
president |
Kwon Namhun |
Konkuk University |
2020.01.01 - 2021.12.31 |
16th |
president |
Lee Huijeong |
Korea University |
2022.01.01 - 2023.12.31 |